THE WALSINGHAM COLLEGE TRUST ASSOCIATION LTD

Charity number: 215863
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
The Revd Prebendary Graeme Rowlands Trustee 01 May 2018
THE CHANTRY BOOK Received: On time
MR A ROBERTS Trustee 29 April 2014
THE CHANTRY BOOK Received: On time
Rev Philip Richard Barnes Trustee 01 September 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT STEPHEN, SOUTH KENSINGTON Received: On time
THE CHANTRY BOOK Received: On time
JOHN DAVID SEBASTIAN BOOTH Trustee 28 April 2015
PALLANT HOUSE GALLERY Received: On time
THE SOCIETY OF ST STEPHEN'S HOUSE Received: 13 days late
PARISH ESTATES CHARITY Received: On time
BROMFIELD'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE JOHN BOOTH CHARITABLE FOUNDATION Received: On time
ASCOT PRIORY Received: On time
ST ANDREW HOLBORN CHURCH FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE CHANTRY BOOK Received: On time
THE CHICHESTER DIOCESAN FUND AND BOARD OF FINANCE (INCORPORATED) Received: On time
LADY ELIZABETH HATTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
JOHN SAYER DOWNING Trustee 30 April 2019
ST SERAPHIM'S TRUST Received: On time
LADY MARY TOWNSHEND'S (APPRENTICING) Received: On time
CLEAVES CHARITY AND OTHERS Received: On time
THE CHANTRY BOOK Received: On time
BOND'S EDUCATIONAL TRUST Received: On time
Rev HOWARD STOKER Trustee 22 October 2012
THE CHANTRY BOOK Received: On time
Amanda McIntyre Trustee 03 October 2017
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
THE CHANTRY BOOK Received: On time
The Rt Revd PHILIP NORTH Chair 04 October 2016
THE CHANTRY BOOK Received: On time