Accounts and annual returns GAINSBOROUGH AND DISTRICT AID IN SICKNESS CHARITY

Charity number: 216124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required