Financial history GAINSBOROUGH AND DISTRICT AID IN SICKNESS CHARITY

Charity number: 216124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.48k £2.86k £2.68k £2.74k £4.04k
Total expenditure £1.73k £1.05k £1.40k £2.75k £1.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A