CUDDRA WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 216182
Charity reporting is up to date (30 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £11.46k £16.26k £20.64k £15.14k £15.91k
Total expenditure £9.95k £16.83k £18.68k £14.19k £16.08k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A