Financial history THE COMMERCIAL TRAVELLERS' BENEVOLENT INSTITUTION

Charity number: 216538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £646.50k £251.30k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £752.43k £6.75m £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £401.49k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £245.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £1.23k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £723.87k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £28.47k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £28.47k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £89 N/A N/A N/A N/A