Trustees THE COMMERCIAL TRAVELLERS' BENEVOLENT INSTITUTION

Charity number: 216538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID LUNDY Trustee 07 December 2016
None on record
Mark Sheridan Trustee 30 January 2016
None on record
Keith James Harold Payne Trustee 01 October 2013
None on record
TREVOR GRANT Trustee 26 March 2011
THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF SALISBURY HOSPITAL
Received: On time
GILLIAN TATE Trustee 26 March 2011
None on record
MICHAEL HILL Trustee 15 March 2003
None on record