QUATFORD CHURCH LANDS CHARITY

Charity number: 216755
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 18 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 18 September 2020 293 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 12 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2016 08 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 Not Required