QUATFORD CHURCH LANDS CHARITY

Charity number: 216755
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RACHEL EDWARDS Trustee 24 May 2011 None on record
David Norman Cooper MA, ACA Trustee 08 August 2017
BRIDGE ADVICE SERVICE Overdue by 503 days
BRIDGNORTH CIVIC SOCIETY Received: On time
Elizabeth Anne Wenlock Trustee 31 July 2019 None on record
Gillian Waugh Pead Trustee 13 July 2016 None on record
Rev SIMON CAWDELL Trustee 26 November 2013
BRIDGNORTH COMMUNITY TRUST Received: On time