THE CHARITY OF ELIZABETH WILLIAMS

Charity number: 216903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.74k £7.95k £8.39k £8.82k £6.43k
Total expenditure £5.55k £7.07k £5.51k £4.69k £16.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A