CODSALL FORGET-ME-NOT CLUB

Charity number: 217515
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £14.04k £13.71k £13.24k £15.57k £3.81k
Total expenditure £15.28k £14.46k £16.39k £14.51k £10.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A