Trustees BRIDGNORTH GENERAL MUNICIPAL CHARITY
Charity number: 217544
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT VINCENT DAVIES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Nicola Jayne Cooper | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|||||
James Gittins | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Oakley | Trustee | 19 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
VANESSA VOYSEY | Trustee | 18 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER RAWLINGS | Trustee | 09 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR TOM BRETTELL | Trustee | 22 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
DEREK MOORHOUSE | Trustee | 03 October 2013 |
|
|||||
DAVID WALKER | Trustee | 03 October 2013 |
|
|||||
HELEN HOWELL | Trustee |
|
||||||
JENNIFER SUSAN DURHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.