Accounts and annual returns PARISH HALL FUND

Charity number: 217593
Charity reporting is overdue by 238 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 238 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 238 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 November 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 November 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required