Accounts and annual returns THE RICHARD ROBERTS FUND

Charity number: 217698
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2021 23 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 10 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2019 10 August 2020 191 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2018 08 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2017 26 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 Not Required