Financial history THE RICHARD ROBERTS FUND

Charity number: 217698
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2017 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020 01/04/2021
Total gross income £7.23k £5.13k £177 £428 £3.15k
Total expenditure £250 £0 £10 £250 £1.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A