FISHGUARD SENIOR CITIZENS' WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 217795
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £2.79k £2.00k £3.65k £1.10k £1.66k