ST SWITHUN'S CHURCH OR MISSION HALL

Charity number: 217994
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 December 2020 19 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 29 December 2019 21 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 29 December 2018 21 July 2020 266 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 29 December 2017 02 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 29 December 2016 25 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 December 2016 Not Required