ESTATE CHARITY OF EDWARD HALL

Charity number: 219120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £3.41k £3.90k £3.96k £4.04k £4.03k
Total expenditure £3.77k £3.90k £3.96k £4.04k £4.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A