Accounts and annual returns ADELAIDE LITTEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 219512
Charity reporting is overdue by 214 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 214 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 214 days
Annual return 30 June 2020 24 July 2022 450 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 24 July 2022 450 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 24 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 24 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 22 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 22 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 15 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 15 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window