Financial history ADELAIDE LITTEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 219512
Charity reporting is overdue by 219 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £313.32k £196.89k £170.75k £129.66k £120.95k
Total expenditure £126.72k £131.05k £173.68k £667.78k £131.10k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A