Accounts and annual returns CHARITY OF MARY JANE CROSS

Charity number: 219708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 December 2018 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required