Financial history CHARITY OF MARY JANE CROSS

Charity number: 219708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £7.89k £7.97k £7.97k £8.29k £8.46k
Total expenditure £7.50k £7.50k £7.50k £8.10k £8.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A