Accounts and annual returns UFM WORLDWIDE

Charity number: 219946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 14 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window