Financial history UFM WORLDWIDE

Charity number: 219946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.24m £3.61m £3.69m £3.83m £3.64m
Total expenditure £3.07m £3.35m £3.93m £3.67m £3.43m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £44.15k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.19m £3.54m £3.62m £3.76m £3.61m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £334 £20
Income - Charitable activities £31.41k £41.29k £36.99k £27.19k £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £22.14k £25.22k £33.20k £36.85k £25.61k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £95.04k £62.76k £84.84k £72.63k £23.62k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.00m £3.25m £3.83m £3.56m £3.39m
Expenditure - Raising funds £76.60k £99.64k £91.72k £107.50k £48.10k
Expenditure - Governance £8.40k £9.31k £8.46k £9.04k £9.58k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £5.12k £6.29k £7.13k £7.78k £7.37k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0