ST CLEMENTS PARISH PROPERTY

Charity number: 220051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £206.20k £202.59k £184.35k £189.14k £196.95k
Total expenditure £138.59k £157.57k £154.40k £222.94k £204.25k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A