MRS T H BROWN WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 220284
Charity reporting is overdue by 1766 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £25.95k £25.18k £91.29k £26.91k £20.53k
Total expenditure £29.10k £28.70k £87.22k £29.16k £29.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A