Financial history NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE DOG AND CAT SHELTER AND ANIMAL SANCTUARY

Charity number: 220506
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £1.27m £1.08m £1.01m £1.13m £1.67m
Total expenditure £1.05m £1.24m £1.24m £1.30m £1.17m
Income from government contracts £36.04k £33.40k £25.38k £25.28k £10.95k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.03m £801.18k £723.42k £863.27k £1.55m
Income - Other trading activities £90.63k £132.34k £145.76k £148.87k £45.10k
Income - Charitable activities £119.42k £122.29k £116.52k £105.57k £58.85k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £28.21k £27.27k £23.85k £16.72k £9.89k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £702.10k £503.03k £408.14k £395.73k £1.16m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £952.63k £1.13m £1.13m £1.07m £1.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds £99.82k £111.04k £117.07k £222.70k £139.12k
Expenditure - Governance £16.01k £19.95k £24.33k £2.03k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £3.70k £5.65k £4.32k £3.61k £2.31k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0