THE BLACKPOOL LADIES' SICK POOR ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 220639
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 January 2017 On time Download