THE BLACKPOOL LADIES' SICK POOR ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 220639
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £29.99k £37.33k £37.39k £44.40k £21.04k
Total expenditure £39.04k £41.17k £40.31k £44.25k £20.71k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A