CHARITY FOR ST JOSEPH'S MISSIONARY SOCIETY (BRITISH REGION)

Charity number: 220690
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 27 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 13 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 09 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 09 August 2017 On time Download