MISS HESTER MARIA PAYNE

Charity number: 220771
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £7.67k £169 £182 £185 £189
Total expenditure £8.36k £169 £0 £185 £189
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A