THE MERSEY MISSION TO SEAFARERS

Charity number: 220793
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £221.69k £156.01k £139.51k £82.04k £71.18k
Total expenditure £124.60k £129.34k £166.43k £173.52k £139.87k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A