THE MILITARY KNIGHTS OF WINDSOR WIDOWS, ORPHANS AND SUPERNUMARY KNIGHTS BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 220884
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.69k £3.96k £4.23k £5.41k £3.98k
Total expenditure £6.65k £150 £6.65k £604 £6.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A