Governing document LEEDS CHURCH INSTITUTE (INCORPORATED)
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/06/1919 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/06/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/05/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/05/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/06/2011 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11/06/2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, ADVANCE AND MAINTAIN WITHIN THE PART OF THE CITY OF LEEDS WHICH IS WITHIN THE DIOCESE OF RIPON AND LEEDS AND ELSEWHERE IN THAT DIOCESE RELIGION AND EDUCATION (BOTH RELIGIOUS AND SECULAR) CONSISTENT WITH THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AS EXPRESSED BY CHURCHES TOGETHER IN ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF RIPON AND LEEDS AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.