HAWARDEN INSTITUTE

Charity number: 220998
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 31 July 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 31 July 2021 1 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 10 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 10 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 23 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 23 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 18 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 18 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 29 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 29 May 2017 On time Download