HAWARDEN INSTITUTE

Charity number: 220998
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £34.65k £30.84k £33.20k £30.87k £37.16k
Total expenditure £36.75k £26.22k £33.66k £31.67k £21.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.60k £0 £1.60k N/A £11.60k