Accounts and annual returns TYNDALE MEMORIAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 221126
Charity reporting is overdue by 57 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 57 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 57 days
Annual return 31 May 2022 30 March 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 22 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 14 June 2021 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 17 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required