Financial history TYNDALE MEMORIAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 221126
Charity reporting is overdue by 53 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £8.70k £9.61k £10.20k £7.74k £8.24k
Total expenditure £5.00k £4.83k £5.91k £5.90k £14.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A