Financial history WENSLEYDALE AND SWALEDALE QUAKER TRUST

Charity number: 221137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £55.53k £62.59k £57.54k £47.74k £65.76k
Total expenditure £42.67k £73.15k £48.48k £71.45k £83.02k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A