ST PAUL'S HOMES SALISBURY

Charity number: 221147
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required