Financial history THE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY OF DAME FRANCES WRAY AND SIR CHRISTOPHER WRAY

Charity number: 221175
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £9.31k £9.65k £9.37k £9.18k £7.29k
Total expenditure £9.92k £6.64k £2.24k £2.94k £3.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A