THE SWANSEA CENTRE FOR DEAF PEOPLE

Charity number: 221220
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £56.79k £44.02k £63.87k £134.46k £138.54k
Total expenditure £57.88k £63.57k £74.53k £259.93k £49.02k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A