HANDMAIDS OF THE SACRED HEART OF JESUS (REGENTS PARK, LONDON, AND CHRISTCHURCH, HANTS )

Charity number: 221319
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £3.08m £2.87m £2.86m £2.72m £2.95m
Total expenditure £2.72m £2.75m £2.82m £2.67m £2.75m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £17.23k N/A N/A £46.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £224.32k £92.06k £64.63k £75.62k £167.51k
Income - Other trading activities £49.23k £51.44k £46.38k £50.17k £25.99k
Income - Charitable activities £2.47m £2.35m £2.34m £2.15m £2.29m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £333.43k £375.43k £411.67k £443.61k £415.45k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £46.00k
Income - Legacies £31.82k £0 £0 £0 £100.10k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.68m £2.69m £2.76m £2.60m £2.70m
Expenditure - Raising funds £46.17k £54.66k £59.78k £72.07k £45.43k
Expenditure - Governance £29.50k £28.93k £32.36k £24.99k £13.98k
Expenditure - Grants institution £48.01k £38.63k £108.53k £73.49k £96.18k
Expenditure - Investment management £46.17k £54.66k £59.78k £72.07k £45.43k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0