THE SOUTH AMERICAN MISSION SOCIETY

Charity number: 221328
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £738.42k £753.31k £645.67k £756.09k £759.49k
Total expenditure £495.70k £635.20k £658.00k £679.29k £617.49k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £343.48k £177.23k £69.11k £185.21k £205.18k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £58.65k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.49k £56.44k £0 £61.81k £55.27k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.74k £2.28k £1.60k £5.44k £1.94k
Income - Other £387.72k £517.37k £516.31k £503.63k £497.10k
Income - Legacies £276.84k £112.91k £5.14k £129.70k £153.99k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £495.70k £635.20k £658.00k £679.29k £617.49k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £5.18k £5.18k £5.50k £5.72k £5.88k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0