MORTLAKE ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES

Charity number: 221899
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 June 2020 13 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 06 June 2019 24 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 06 June 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 06 June 2017 28 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 06 June 2016 26 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 June 2016 Not Required