MORTLAKE ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES

Charity number: 221899
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 06/06/2016 06/06/2017 06/06/2018 06/06/2019 06/06/2020
Total gross income £16.52k £18.89k £21.08k £16.15k £21.10k
Total expenditure £25.04k £15.01k £13.02k £18.83k £39.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A