Financial history ST ALBANS OLD PEOPLE'S TRUST

Charity number: 222522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £139.50k £147.85k £152.04k £155.62k £181.69k
Total expenditure £142.78k £144.89k £215.95k £213.29k £255.36k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A