Trustees ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS DERBY AND DISTRICT BRANCH

Charity number: 222620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dianne Turner Chair 21 June 2017
None on record
Stacey Hinckley Trustee 22 June 2022
None on record
Lisa Wilding Trustee 22 June 2022
None on record
Jane Measom-Stevenson Trustee 22 June 2022
None on record
Suzanne Whetton Trustee 06 January 2020
None on record
Margaret Harper Trustee 06 January 2020
None on record
Abbie Belso Trustee 13 May 2019
None on record
Michelle Mackenzie-Cooper Trustee 23 July 2018
None on record
Patrick Joseph Walsh Trustee 13 February 2018
None on record
JANET MORGAN Trustee 04 December 2012
OUTDOORS FOR ALL
Received: On time