Financial history THE ABBEYFIELD NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 222742
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £2.54m £1.83m £1.96m £2.01m £2.03m
Total expenditure £1.73m £1.81m £1.85m £1.98m £2.02m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £122.57k £81.85k
Income - Donations and legacies £4.74k £6.41k £5.74k £3.48k £2.79k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.72m £1.79m £1.87m £1.96m £1.97m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £21.93k £15.23k £48.41k £35.61k £43.60k
Income - Other £792.70k £21.01k £38.79k £16.96k £15.23k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.73m £1.80m £1.84m £1.96m £2.00m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.53k £9.34k £18.29k £18.64k £21.29k
Expenditure - Governance £7.17k £7.13k £6.54k £6.54k £6.54k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £2.53k £9.34k £18.29k £18.64k £21.29k
Expenditure - Other £2.85k £2.08k £0 £0 £0