SOUTHPORT AND DISTRICT CENTRE FOR THE DEAF

Charity number: 222928
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 April 2019 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 06 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 09 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required