Trustees THE BROADHEATH MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 223041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MIKE BEARD Chair 29 July 2011
None on record
STUART MICHAEL BEARD Trustee 12 June 2017
None on record
LATA TAYLOR Trustee 15 April 2017
None on record
TIMOTHY COGGER Trustee 15 April 2016
None on record
JOAN HAYES Trustee 20 July 2012
None on record
ANTHONY HOBDAY Trustee
None on record